Global Patent Index - EP 0987493 A1

EP 0987493 A1 2000-03-22 - Burner for a heat generator

Title (en)

Burner for a heat generator

Title (de)

Brenner für einen Wärmeerzeuger

Title (fr)

Brûleur pour générateur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0987493 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810922 A

Priority

EP 98810922 A

Abstract (en)

The burner is designed so that downstream of the fuel injector at least one sensor (400) is arranged for determining a block-back of the flame (80) from the combustion chamber (30) in the inside of the burner, fuel regulation is activated. The fuel supply to the flame is reduced at least temporarily and the fuel amount to the pilot burner is increased simultaneously to maintain a constant turbine output.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Brenner zum Betrieb einer Brennkammer besteht dieser im wesentlichen aus einem Drallerzeuger (100), einem dem Drallerzeuger nachgeschalteten Uebergangsstück und einem diesem Uebergangsstück nachgeschalteten Mischrohr. Uebergangsstück und Mischrohr bilden die Mischstrecke (220) des Brenners und sind stromauf eines Brennraumes (30) angeordnet. Im unteren Bereich des Mischrohres ist ein Pilotbrennersystem (300) angeordnet, welches bei minimierten Schadstoff-Emissionen unter anderen eine Stabilisation der Flammenfront, insbesondere in den transienten Lastbereichen bildet. Ein im Brenner angebrachter Sensor (400) erfasst ein Zurückschlagen der Flamme (80), worauf unmittelbar mindestens temporär die Brennstoffmenge dieser Flamme reduziert und gleichzeitig die Brennstoffmenge der Pilotbrenner erhöht wird, dergestalt, dass die Gesamtbrennstoffmenge und somit die Turbinenleistung konstant gehalten werden. Mit dieser Vorkehrung wird eine Zerstörung des Brenners verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 23/00; F23D 14/02; F23D 14/82; F23D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01); F23D 14/02 (2006.01); F23D 14/82 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01); F23D 23/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/08 (2006.01); F23R 3/30 (2006.01); F23R 3/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 11/402 (2013.01); F23D 14/02 (2013.01); F23D 14/82 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23D 23/00 (2013.01); F23N 5/082 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23D 2209/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987493 A1 20000322; EP 0987493 B1 20030806; CA 2282153 A1 20000316; DE 59809222 D1 20030911; JP 2000097407 A 20000404; JP 4344049 B2 20091014; US 6210152 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59809222

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809222

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2004-09-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809222 P 20030911

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI