Global Patent Index - EP 0987494 A1

EP 0987494 A1 2000-03-22 - Process for cooling a grate of a furnace and grate of a furnace

Title (en)

Process for cooling a grate of a furnace and grate of a furnace

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kühlung eines Rostes für einen Feuerungsraum sowie Rost für einen Feuerungsraum

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le refroidissement d'une grille d'un foyer et grille d'un foyer

Publication

EP 0987494 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810918 A

Priority

EP 98810918 A

Abstract (en)

Cooling liquid is supplied to the grating. With the contact of the liquid with the grating, the liquid is completely vaporized and the vaporizing heat is removed from the grating. The hollow cavity (7) of the grating rod (2) as the underside at the cooling liquid is supplied to the underside.

Abstract (de)

Zur Kühlung eines Rostes mit abwechselnd feststehenden und beweglichen Reihen (1, 1') von Roststäben (2) wird in nach unten offene Hohlräume (7) der Roststäbe (2) aus im Unterwindbereich (8) liegenden Sprührohren (10) Kühlflüssigkeit gesprüht, welches dabei im wesentlichen vollständig verdampft, so dass den Roststäben (2) die Verdampfungswärme entzogen wird. Der Winkelbereich (12), in den gesprüht wird, kann so eingestellt sein, dass jeweils lediglich diejenigen Abschnitte der Roststäbe (2) besprüht werden, deren Oberseiten die freie Oberfläche des Rostes bilden. Die Hohlräume können auch bis auf eine in den Unterwindbereich führende Abzugsöffnung geschlossen und mit einem Vorratsbehälter verbunden sein, in welchem der Flüssigkeitsspiegel konstant auf einem Niveau gehalten wird, das knapp unterhalb der Abzugsöffnungen liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/00 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/04 (2013.01); F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987494 A1 20000322; JP 2000088231 A 20000331; KR 20000023137 A 20000425; NO 994401 A 20000316; NO 994401 D0 19990910; TW 406171 B 20000921; US 6213031 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI