Global Patent Index - EP 0987497 A1

EP 0987497 A1 2000-03-22 - Cooking chamber with thermal insulation

Title (en)

Cooking chamber with thermal insulation

Title (de)

Backofenmuffel mit thermischer Isolierung

Title (fr)

Enceinte de cuisson avec isolation thermique

Publication

EP 0987497 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118118 A

Priority

DE 19842247 A

Abstract (en)

The oven (2) is square or rectangular in shape and has heater elements (8) under the roof and in cutouts (4) under the floor. The inner part of the wall may be made of one piece of metal sheet, and the outer wall (16) may be made of separate pieces of sheet for the roof (16a), the rear wall (16b) and the floor (16c). There may be separate sheets for the side walls. The inner walls are flat, with rounded corners. The outer walls may be slightly concave as seen from the outside, with outward-extending flanges joined together at their edges. The space between the inner and outer walls is filled with granular material (24).

Abstract (de)

Eine Backofenmuffel (2) weist eine doppelte Isolierwandung (14, 16) auf. Die innere und/oder äußere Isolierwandung (16) ist jeweils zur anderen hin vorgespannt und übt so einen ständigen Druck auf die zwischen den Isolierwandungen eingeschlossene Isolieschicht (24) auf, die aus Partikelmaterial besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19842247 A1 20000316; EP 0987497 A1 20000322; US 6080966 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030929

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000907

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI