Global patent index - EP 0987509 A1

EP 0987509 A1 2000-03-22 - Heat transfer apparatus

Title (en)

Heat transfer apparatus

Title (de)

Wärmeaustauschvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'échange de chaleur

Publication

EP 0987509 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307326 A

Priority

FR 9811506 A

Abstract (en)

A reversible capillary pumped heat transfer loop for transferring heat between first and second locations (2,3) and comprising, at each location, a heat transfer unit (1) for evaporating a working fluid when the unit is required to remove heat and for condensing the working fluid when the unit is required to deliver heat, each such unit (1) including a capillary device (19,20) and one or more channels (10) associated with the capillary device for the collection of fluid from it when the unit is acting as an evaporator and for the feeding of fluid to it when the unit is acting as a condenser whereby each unit comprises a fluid reservoir (18) into which the capillary device extends, the combined volumes of the reservoirs and the amount of working fluid in the loop being selected to ensure that there is always sufficient liquid in the reservoir to keep the capillary devices saturated with liquid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/043 (2013.01); F28D 15/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] WO 9700416 A1 19970103 - B C A SA [BE], et al
  • [DA] FR 2723187 A1 19960202 - CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]
  • [A] FR 2752291 A1 19980213 - CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]
  • [A] EP 0242669 A1 19871028 - DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH [DE]
  • [A] US 4765396 A 19880823 - SEIDENBERG BENJAMIN [US]
  • [A] FR 2216537 A1 19740830 - GAZ DE FRANCE [FR]
  • [X] KOTLYAROV ET AL: "Methods of Increase of the Evaporators Reliability for Loop Heat Pipes and Capillary Pumped Loops", SAE 1993 TRANSACTIONS JOURNAL OF AEROSPACE, vol. 102 (section1), 1993, Society of Automotive Engineers, Warrendale, XP000197437
  • [A] VAN OOST ET AL: "Test results of reliable and very high capillary multi-evaporators /condenser loop", CALODUCS ET BOUCLES DIPHASIQUES A POMPAGE CAPILLAIRE, 3 May 1996 (1996-05-03), Société Française des Thermiciens, PARIS, XP002104571

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987509 A1 20000322; EP 0987509 B1 20030716; FR 2783313 A1 20000317

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150805

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-03-17 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-17 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: ATRIUM SAS, RUE LAURENT PICHAT, FR-75016 PARIS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: ASTRIUM SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-11-06 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2009-11-06 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-11-06 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2009-11-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE FR IT NL

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020109

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE FR IT NL

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE FR IT NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI