Global Patent Index - EP 0987511 A2

EP 0987511 A2 2000-03-22 - Bullet and splinter protection material/burglary protection material

Title (en)

Bullet and splinter protection material/burglary protection material

Title (de)

Material zum Schutz gegen Einbruch, Kugeln und Geschosssplitter

Title (fr)

Matériau résistant aux vols, balles et fragments

Publication

EP 0987511 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99660128 A

Priority

  • FI 981978 A
  • FI 991019 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a bullet and splinter protection material / burglary protection material manufactured by the SHS technique and based on titanium carbide TiC, titanium boride TiB, titanium diboride TiB2 or titanium carbide aluminium oxide TiC-Al2O3 and a metallic binder. The invention also concerns a protective material manufactured by the SHS technique which forms a gradient and lamellar structure and is attached to other protective materials. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/05 (2006.01); C22C 29/00 (2006.01); F41H 5/02 (2006.01); F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/058 (2013.01); C22C 29/00 (2013.01); F41H 5/02 (2013.01); F41H 5/0428 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987511 A2 20000322; EP 0987511 A3 20000906; EE 9900265 A 20000417; FI 109132 B 20020531; FI 991019 A0 19990504; FI 991019 A 20000315; NO 994130 A 20000315; NO 994130 D0 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021024

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010303;LT PAYMENT 20010303;LV PAYMENT 20010303;MK PAYMENT 20010303;RO PAYMENT 20010303;SI PAYMENT 20010303

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010303

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI