Global Patent Index - EP 0987512 A3

EP 0987512 A3 2000-08-16 - Long-distance shot cartridge

Title (en)

Long-distance shot cartridge

Title (de)

Schrotpatrone für grosse Entfernungen

Title (fr)

Cartouche à plombs pour le tir à grande distance

Publication

EP 0987512 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99115809 A

Priority

IT MI980608 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987512A2] A long-distance shot cartridge, of the type comprising a wad member (5) provided between the shot (7) and the explosive powder (3), in which the shot (7) is housed in a hollow containing element (6) of substantially cylindrical shape constructed of a plastic material, said element (6) being open at that face (A) facing said wad member (5) and being closed at its other face (B), said containing element externally comprising at least one projection (6B, 6C) favouring fall-off of said element after firing and after said element together with the shot contained therein has travelled through a predetermined distance of between about 1/3 and 3/4 of the cartridge range, said fall-off of the containing element enabling a group of shot to be formed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987512 A2 20000322; EP 0987512 A3 20000816; IT 244249 Y1 20020311; IT MI980608 U1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1023809

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2001-12-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEDDITE ITALIA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORLANDI, SILVIO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI