Global Patent Index - EP 0987552 A2

EP 0987552 A2 2000-03-22 - Diarylsulfonylurea binding proteins

Title (en)

Diarylsulfonylurea binding proteins

Title (de)

Diarylsulphonylharnstoff-Bindungsproteine

Title (fr)

Protéines de liaison pour diarylsulfonylurée

Publication

EP 0987552 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306574 A

Priority

US 9844898 P

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to the identification of diarylsulfonylurea binding proteins (DBPs) as therapeutic targets for agents that suppress the release of inflammatory mediators such as interleukin IL-1 and IL-1 beta . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/68; C07D 303/44; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/33 (2006.01); A61K 31/336 (2006.01); A61K 31/64 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 311/60 (2006.01); C07D 303/34 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/52 (2013.01); C07D 303/34 (2013.01); C07K 14/715 (2013.01); G01N 33/6893 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); G01N 2333/545 (2013.01); G01N 2500/04 (2013.01); G01N 2500/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987552 A2 20000322; EP 0987552 A3 20000607; BR 9904054 A 20001017; CA 2280049 A1 20000229; JP 2000095796 A 20000404; JP 2003057227 A 20030226; JP 2004339232 A 20041202; JP 3706353 B2 20051012; US 2002034764 A1 20020321; US 6461822 B2 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051011

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 33/68 A, 7G 01N 33/50 B, 7C 07D 303/44 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7A 61K 31/64 B

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990828

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI