Global Patent Index - EP 0987596 A1

EP 0987596 A1 2000-03-22 - Film development apparatus

Title (en)

Film development apparatus

Title (de)

Film-Entwicklungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil de développement de film

Publication

EP 0987596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118416 A

Priority

DE 29816636 U

Abstract (en)

Each rack has roller pairs of larger diameter roller (13a) and smaller diameter roller (13b). Section between roller edges (20) is concave with diameter (23) decreasing from edges to centre. Second roller (13b) is pressed by spring against first. Film strip is fed between rollers. Wide roll film has both edges reaching into guide grooves (12a,12b) of frame and miniature film is fed either in middle of rollers or at side with one side protruding into feed groove (12a).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Filmentwicklungsmaschine mit mehreren Chemikalienbadtanks (3,4,5,6) durch die ein zu entwickelnder Filmstreifen (8a,8b) mäanderförmig hindurchtransportierbar ist, und mehreren zum Antrieb und zur Umlenkung des Filmstreifens dienenden kalanderartigen Antriebswalzenpaaren (15,16,17), wobei sich der Durchmesser einer ersten Walze (13a) von deren Rändern hier zur Walzenmitte hin kontinuierlich verjüngt, während die zweite Walze (13b) eine zylindrische Oberfläche aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 3/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 6 30 June 1997 (1997-06-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987596 A1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-05-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FILM DEVELOPMENT APPARATUS

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI