Global patent index - EP 0987598 A1

EP 0987598 A1 2000-03-22 - Device for the intermediate storage of sheetlike photographic material

Title (en)

Device for the intermediate storage of sheetlike photographic material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zwischenspeichern von blattförmigem, fotografischem Material

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le stockage intermédiaire de feuilles photographiques

Publication

EP 0987598 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117703 A

Priority

DE 19842443 A

Abstract (en)

Stocker (1) has a monitoring unit, step motor (17-22) control device (23) and input sensors (24a,24b) to monitor positions of intermediate stored sheets of photographic material. Controller (23) controls turn speeds of driven rollers so that, during operation turn speed of each roller (9-16) is independent from turn speeds of other rollers and is dependent on the monitored positions. Distance between two rollers is smaller or same as sheet length.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Zwischenspeichern von blattförmigem, fotografischem Material (4 - 8) vorgeschlagen. Diese Vorrichtung weist einen Eingang (2) zum Empfangen des Materials (4 - 8), einen Ausgang (3) zum Ausgeben des Materials (4 - 8) und mehrere drehbar gelagerte Rollen (9 - 16; 40, 41) auf, die zum Transportieren des blattförmigen Materials (4 - 8) von dem Eingang (2) zu dem Ausgang (3) vorgesehen sind und von wenigstens einem Antriebsmittel (17 - 22) antreibbar sind. Erfindungsgemäß ist weiterhin ein Überwachungsmittel (23, 24A, 24B) zum Überwachen von Positionen von zwischengespeicherten Blättern (4 - 8) des fotografischen Materials (4 - 8) vorhanden. Ein Steuermittel (23) steuert die Drehgeschwindigkeiten der antreibbaren Rollen (9 - 16; 40, 41) so, daß im Betrieb die Drehgeschwindigkeit wenigstens einer der Rollen (9 - 16; 40, 41) unabhängig von den Drehgeschwindigkeiten der anderen Rollen (9 - 16; 40, 41) und abhängig von den überwachten Positionen einstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/10 (2006.01); G03D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 13/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987598 A1 20000322; DE 19842443 C1 20000420; JP 2000098579 A 20000407; US 6190064 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031006

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI