Global Patent Index - EP 0987609 A1

EP 0987609 A1 2000-03-22 - Annual calendar mechanism for clockwork-movement

Title (en)

Annual calendar mechanism for clockwork-movement

Title (de)

Jährlicher Kalendermechanismus für Uhrwerk

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de quantième annuel pour mouvement d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 0987609 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98117414 A

Priority

EP 98117414 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism has a date disc (14) fitted with a first interior disc (18) having 31 teeth, on which are placed 31 numerals, for the date. The disc is driven by a moving part with a finger that drives the disc one tooth step a day. The disc has a second interior disc (22) with teeth designed to drive a part of the watch mechanism at the end of each month, using a gear train, and a month cam having five teeth, corresponding to the 31 day months . Each of the teeth of the second interior disc is arranged so that they are positioned, at the end of a thirtyone day month, in the path of the tip (54) of a swinging lever (56) mechanism. The lever mechanism is linked to a mobile correction drive (28) fitted with a correction finger (30) designed to co-operate with the first or second teeth on the inner discs (18,22), at the month end so as to drive the date disc a supplementary step when the lever mechanism pivots following the passage of its tip (54) onto the teeth of the month cam.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un mécanisme de quantième annuel comportant un disque des quantièmes muni d'une première denture intérieure comportant trente et une dents, et un mobile entraîneur de quantième comprenant un doigt susceptible d'entraîner d'un pas une fois par jour ledit disque, caractérisé en ce que le disque comprend une deuxième denture intérieure prévue pour entraîner, via un train d'engrenage, une came des mois portant au moins cinq dents, chacune de ces dents étant arrangée pour se trouver sur le chemin du bec d'une bascule à la fin des mois de moins de trente et un jours, et en ce que ladite bascule porte un mobile entraîneur de correction équipé d'un doigt de correction coopérant avec la première ou la deuxième denture à la fin des mois cités pour entraîner le disque d'un pas supplémentaire à la fin desdits mois lorsque la bascule pivote suite au passage de son bec sur une dent de ladite came. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/247

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/2536 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H03953475 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987609 A1 20000322; EP 0987609 B1 20031126; DE 69820052 D1 20040108

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-31 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: BLANCPLAIN SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FREDERIC PIGUET S.A., CH

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-05-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031126

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2004-02-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820052 P 20040108

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031126

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI