Global Patent Index - EP 0987659 A1

EP 0987659 A1 2000-03-22 - Storage magazine for card-shaped data carriers

Title (en)

Storage magazine for card-shaped data carriers

Title (de)

Speichermagazin für kartenförmige Datenträger

Title (fr)

Magasin de stockage pour des porteurs de données en forme de carte

Publication

EP 0987659 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117396 A

Priority

EP 98117396 A

Abstract (en)

The storage magazine (1) has an essentially square housing for accommodating a stack of successive card-shaped data media, with an output slot for extraction of the end medium. A movable blocking element (36) on the housing can be moved between a first position in which it blocks a housing opening, preferably the output opening, against medium removal, and a second position in which the opening is clear.

Abstract (de)

Um Speichermagazin (1) für kartenförmige Datenträger für den Einsatz in Ausgabeautomaten, mit einem im wesentlichen quaderförmigen Gehäuse (2) zur Aufnahme eines Stapels aufeinanderliegender kartenförmiger Datenträger, welches einen Ausgabeschlitz (29) aufweist, aus dem jeweils ein an einem Ende des Stapels befindlicher kartenförmiger Datenträger durch den Ausgabeautomaten aus dem Speichermagazin (1) entnehmbar ist, dahingehend weiterzubilden, daß dieses gegen Datenträgerverlust gesichert sowie wirtschaftlich herstellbar und einfach zu handhaben ist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß an dem Gehäuse ein zwischen einer eine Gehäuseöffnung, vorzugsweise den Ausgabeschlitz (29) gegen Entnahme eines kartenförmigen Datenträgers versperrenden Sperrposition und einer die Öffnung freigebenden Freigabeposition bewegbares Sperrglied (31) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00; G07B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/26 (2006.01); G07B 3/04 (2006.01); G07F 17/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/266 (2013.01); G07B 3/04 (2013.01); G07F 17/42 (2013.01); B65H 2407/33 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1914 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0821325 A1 19980128 - SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987659 A1 20000322; EP 0987659 B1 20050309; DE 59812637 D1 20050414

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812637

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141007

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-04-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEIDT & BACHMANN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120930

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812637 P 20050414

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR LU NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI