Global Patent Index - EP 0987675 A1

EP 0987675 A1 2000-03-22 - Method and apparatus for processing video pictures, especially for false contour effect compensation

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for processing video pictures, especially for false contour effect compensation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Video-Bildbearbeitung, insbesondere zur Kompensation des Falschkontureneffekts

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé de traitement d'images vidéo, en particulier pour la correction de faux contour

Publication

EP 0987675 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99117531 A

Priority

  • EP 99117531 A
  • EP 98117523 A
  • EP 98121334 A

Abstract (en)

With the new plasma display panel technology new kinds of artefacts can occur in video pictures. These artefacts are commonly described as "dynamic false contour effect", since they correspond to disturbances of gray levels and colors in the form of an apparition of colored edges in the picture when the observation point on the PDP screen moves. According to the invention, such an artefact is compensated by analyzing the pictures, and determining the pixels which need to be corrected. The digital sub-field code words of these pixels are replaced by corrected sub-field code words. Thereby, the correction sub-fields (C1, C2, C3) which are inserted in or omitted from the digital code word are selected under consideration of its position within the frame period for optimal results. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2033 (2013.01); G09G 3/2029 (2013.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0266 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0285 (2013.01); G09G 2320/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0720139 A2 19960703 - PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]
  • [Y] EP 0822536 A2 19980204 - FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0840274 A1 19980506 - FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0847037 A1 19980610 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [XY] YAMAGUCHI T ET AL: "IMPROVEMENT IN PDP PICTURE QUALITY BY THREE-DIMENSIONAL SCATTERING OF DYNAMIC FALSE CONTOURS", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, SAN DIEGO, MAY 12 - 17, 1996, no. VOL. 27, 12 May 1996 (1996-05-12), SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, pages 291 - 294, XP002055281

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987675 A1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020315

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI