Global patent index - EP 0987718 A1

EP 0987718 A1 2000-03-22 - Impregnation compound for electrical cables

Title (en)

Impregnation compound for electrical cables

Title (de)

Imprägnierzusammensetzung für elektrische Kabel

Title (fr)

Composition d'imprégnation pour cables électriques

Publication

EP 0987718 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99401901 A

Priority

NO 984234 A

Abstract (en)

An impregnation compound for electrical cables, especially for high voltage DC power cables, with an insulation of a plurality of permeable tapes, has a high nearly constant viscosity of 200 - 700 Pas up to an operating cable conductor temperature of at least 40 DEG C and low viscosity of less than 0.1 Pas in a temperature range of about 75 DEG to 130 DEG C. The compound consists of 80-98wt% of a mineral oil, 1-10wt% of a thermoplastic elastomer and 1-10wt% of a gas absorbing agent, especially dibenzyltoluene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 3/22; H01B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 9/06 (2006.01); H01B 3/22 (2006.01); H01B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/22 (2013.01); H01B 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987718 A1 20000322; JP 2000090750 A 20000331; NO 984234 A 20000315; NO 984234 D0 19980914

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030312

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DK GB IT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI