Global Patent Index - EP 0987725 A2

EP 0987725 A2 2000-03-22 - Rotary switch in particular a stepping switch

Title (en)

Rotary switch in particular a stepping switch

Title (de)

Drehschalter, insbesondere Stufenschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur rotatif en particulier interrupteur à échelons

Publication

EP 0987725 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116161 A

Priority

DE 19842649 A

Abstract (en)

The rotary switch has a segmented sliding track and a contact element for making the slip contact. There is only one segmented slide track in a common plane and the contact element or the slip contact (4) is electrically connected to a highly flexible braid (5) for preventing a further unsegmented double slip track.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Drehschalter, insbesondere einen Stufenschalter für den Einsatz in Kraftfahrzeugen mit segmentierter Schleifbahn sowie mit Kontaktelement zur Schleifkontakterzeugung. Um bei einem Drehschalter dieser Art eine Verringerung der maximalen Betätigungselemente und eine Verringerung der Verlustleistung im Stufenschalter selbst zu erreichen, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß lediglich ein in einer zusammenhängenden Ebene segmentierte Schleifbahn (10) vorgesehen ist und das Kontaktelement bzw. der Schleifkontakt (4) mit einer hochflexiblen Litze (5) zur Vermeidung einer weiteren unsegmentierten Doppelschleifbahn elektrisch leitend verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/58; H01H 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01H 19/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/585 (2013.01); H01H 1/5822 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987725 A2 20000322; EP 0987725 A3 20010321; DE 19842649 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060404

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI