Global Patent Index - EP 0987726 A2

EP 0987726 A2 2000-03-22 - Key-controlled safety switch

Title (en)

Key-controlled safety switch

Title (de)

Schlüsselsicherheitsschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de sécurité à clé

Publication

EP 0987726 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118263 A

Priority

IT VI980169 A

Abstract (en)

A key-controlled safety switch assembly includes a box-like case (2) anchorable to a fixed part of a protection or barrier of a machine or installation and provided with one or more slots (5), an actuating key (3) anchorable to a moving part of the protection and insertable in any of the slots (5). The case (2) contains internally thereof a safety electric circuit (6) for selectively closing/opening a general relais or a safety switch of the machine or installation on insertion/extraction of actuating key (3), locking parts (9) for selectively locking the actuating key (3) in the inserted position in a slot (5) until the dangerous parts of the machine or installation are moving, a detecting device (13) for detecting the position of the key (3) to allow closing of the safety switch (6). The detecting device (13) is exclusively of the electronic type acting from distance, and the key (3) is shaped so as to enter freely in the slot (5) with a minimal predetermined clearance (s). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 27/00; H01H 36/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 27/00 (2006.01); H01H 36/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 36/0046 (2013.01); H01H 27/007 (2013.01); H01H 2027/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987726 A2 20000322; EP 0987726 A3 20010307; EP 0987726 B1 20050803; DE 69926455 D1 20050908; DE 69926455 T2 20060330; IT VI980169 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-05 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: PIZZATO, BERNARDO

2005-10-05 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: PIZZATO, GIUSEPPE

2005-10-05 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: PIZZATO, MARCO

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69926455

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIZZATO ELETTRICA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI