Global Patent Index - EP 0987792 A3

EP 0987792 A3 2000-10-18 - Circuit board mounted electrical connector

Title (en)

Circuit board mounted electrical connector

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für Leiterplattenmontage

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour plaque à circuits imprimés

Publication

EP 0987792 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99118304 A

Priority

SG 1998003661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987792A2] An electrical connector is provided for mounting on one side of a circuit board. The connector includes an elongated dielectric housing having a board mounting face and defining a longitudinal center line. A board retention member projects from the board mounting face on one side of the center line for insertion into an appropriate hole in the circuit board. A recess is provided in the board mounting face on an opposite side of the center line and located for accommodating a board retention member projecting through the circuit board from a connecting device mounted on an opposite side of the circuit board. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16; H01R 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6485 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 12/7029 (2013.01); H01R 12/7064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987792 A2 20000322; EP 0987792 A3 20001018; CN 1254209 A 20000524; JP 2000138080 A 20000516; JP 3213891 B2 20011002; KR 20000023154 A 20000425; SG 106555 A1 20041029; TW 427581 U 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010605

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/16 A, 7H 01R 12/22 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI