Global Patent Index - EP 0987794 A1

EP 0987794 A1 2000-03-22 - Management system for electrical networks with improved connection means

Title (en)

Management system for electrical networks with improved connection means

Title (de)

Verwaltungssystem für elektrische Netze mit verbesserten Verbindungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Ensemble de gestion de réseaux électriques comportant des moyens de connexion perfectionnés

Publication

EP 0987794 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402260 A

Priority

FR 9811485 A

Abstract (en)

The plug in cartridge assembly has a cartridge which plugs into a base unit which is connected to the electrical circuitry. The connection mechanism has an electrical contact (225) which is U-shaped so that when the plug section connection (320,321) is connected the current flow forms an electromagnetic field providing strong connection.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif (10) de gestion d'un réseau électrique, comportant un premier module (20) muni de moyens de raccordement (211) avec ledit réseau et un deuxième module (30) pouvant être connecté électriquement au premier module grâce à des moyens de connexion (222, 225, 320) des deux modules Selon l'invention, lesdits moyens de connexion comportent des moyens de contact (225) dont la forme est telle que traversés par un courant, lesdits moyens de contact (225) tendent à se plaquer contre des éléments de connexion (320, 222) complémentaires appartenant aux moyens de connexion, sous l'effet des forces électromagnétiques mise en jeu. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/193; H01H 1/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/54 (2006.01); H01R 13/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/54 (2013.01); H01R 13/193 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987794 A1 20000322; EP 0987794 B1 20030115; DE 69904897 D1 20030220; DE 69904897 T2 20031120; FR 2783362 A1 20000317; FR 2783362 B1 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150915

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150915

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69904897

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69904897

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/193 A, 7H 01H 1/54 B, 7H 01T 4/02 B

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI