Global Patent Index - EP 0987803 A1

EP 0987803 A1 2000-03-22 - Protection device for electric installations against alimentation disturbances

Title (en)

Protection device for electric installations against alimentation disturbances

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung für elektrischen Anlagen gegen Speisungsstörungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection d'installations électriques contre les pertubations de l'alimentation.

Publication

EP 0987803 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402259 A

Priority

FR 9811487 A

Abstract (en)

The overvoltage protection mechanism is connected via a connector (22a,22b) and a lightning conductor (40a) ins connected in circuit. The second connection is connected to a conductor piece (400a) with a fusing connection (25a) maintaining a connector piece (27a) in position until an overvoltage when the connector piece disconnects.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de protection contre des surtensions d'appareils électriques auxquels le dispositif est relié via des moyens de connexion comportant au moins deux connecteurs (22a, 23a), le dispositif comprenant également une cellule parafoudre (40a) dont un premier pôle est directement relié à un premier desdits connecteurs (23a). Selon l'invention, un deuxième pôle de la cellule est connecté à une première pièce conductrice (400a), le dispositif comprend également une deuxième pièce conductrice directement reliée à un deuxième desdits connecteurs (22a) et le dispositif comprend également des moyens de liaison fusible (25a) pour maintenir un curseur (27a) rigide en contact électrique avec lesdites pièces conductrices dans une position de fonctionnement du dispositif, des moyens (28a) étant prévus pour solliciter en permanence le curseur vers une position d'ouverture du dispositif dans laquelle ledit curseur n'est plus en contact avec les deux pièces conductrices. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 1/12; H01C 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/12 (2006.01); H01T 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/12 (2013.01); H01C 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] EP 0716493 A1 19960612 - SOULE MATERIEL ELECTR [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987803 A1 20000322; EP 0987803 B1 20021204; DE 69904274 D1 20030116; DE 69904274 T2 20030828; FR 2783365 A1 20000317; FR 2783365 B1 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110915

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110915

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-19 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040828

2004-01-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SOULE PROTECTION SURTENSIONS

2003-11-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LEGRAND

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904274 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020411

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI