Global Patent Index - EP 0987925 A1

EP 0987925 A1 2000-03-22 - EL light emission device

Title (en)

EL light emission device

Title (de)

EL-Lichtemittierendes Element

Title (fr)

Dispositif électroluminescent d'émission de lumière

Publication

EP 0987925 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98117604 A

Priority

EP 98117604 A

Abstract (en)

An EL light emission device includes an expanded plastic layer (6,7) provided on at least one of front and rear surfaces of an EL panel (E), as a damping means to absorb vibration. The expanded plastic layer has bubbles existing therein, and absorbs vibration propagating to a communication means of a handy telephone, thus serving to suppres against noise occurrence. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 33/02; H05B 33/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/02 (2006.01); H05B 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/02 (2013.01); H05B 33/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] DATABASE WPI Section EI Week 9902, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class U14, AN 99-015438, XP002091505
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 013 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 013 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 005 (E - 165) 16 January 1980 (1980-01-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987925 A1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI