Global Patent Index - EP 0987930 A2

EP 0987930 A2 2000-03-22 - Anode for a transferred-arc plasma torch

Title (en)

Anode for a transferred-arc plasma torch

Title (de)

Anode für Plasma-Auftragsbrenner

Title (fr)

Anode pour une torche à plasma à arc transferé

Publication

EP 0987930 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116588 A

Priority

DE 19842074 A

Abstract (en)

The anode has a slender cylindrical anode body (1) with a connecting flange (2) with a central bore (4) for the cathode needle (3) and axial operating medium bores (5') leading to the anode tip, which is a separate tip fitting (6'). At least one extension piece (9) with corresp. bores arranged between the end of the anode body and the tip fitting has positive and negative radial guides at opposite ends and arrangements at both ends for aligning the bores.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anode für Plasma-Auftragsbrenner insbesondere zur Bodenbeschichtung enger und tiefer Sacklöcher, bestehend aus einem schlank-zylindrischen Anodenkörper (1) mit Anschlußflansch (2), von dem aus um eine die Kathodennadel (3) aufnehmende Zentralbohrung (4) weitere, im wesentlichen axial orientierte Betriebsmittelbohrungen (5) zur Anodenspitze (6) geführt sind, die als separater Spitzenansatz (6') in in bohrungsfluchtender Position und mit Radialführung (7) am mit einer entsprechenden Radialführung (7') versehenen Ende (8) des Anodenkörpers (1) angeordnet ist, wobei zwischen dem Ende (8) des Anodenkörpers (1) und dem Spitzenansatz (6') mindestens ein entsprechende Bohrungen (4, 5) aufweisendes Verlängerungsstück (9) angeordnet ist, das an einem Ende (9') eine Positivradialführung (10) und anderen Ende (9'') eine Negativradialführung (10') aufweist und an beiden Enden (9',9'') Mittel (11) zur bohrungsge rechten Zuordnung des Verlängerungsstückes (9) zum Anodenkörper (1) und des Spitzenansatzes (6') zum Verlängerungsstück (9). Damit ist die Aufgabe gelöst, trotz größerer, d.h., bisherige Längen überschreitende Längen exakte Bohrungsverläufe im Anodenkörper zu gewährleisten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/34 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3478 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987930 A2 20000322; EP 0987930 A3 20021016; DE 19842074 A1 20000406; DE 19842074 B4 20040603

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI