Global Patent Index - EP 0987936 A1

EP 0987936 A1 2000-03-29 - FATTY ACID DESATURASES AND MUTANT SEQUENCES THEREOF

Title (en)

FATTY ACID DESATURASES AND MUTANT SEQUENCES THEREOF

Title (de)

FETTSÄUREDESATURASEN UND MUTIERTE SEQUENZEN DAVON

Title (fr)

DESATURASES D'ACIDE GRAS ET LEURS SEQUENCES MUTANTES

Publication

EP 0987936 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929058 A

Priority

  • US 9812332 W
  • US 87410997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856239A1] Seeds, plants and oils are provided having high oleic acid; low linoleic acid; and low linoleic acid plus linolenic acid; and advantageous functional or nutritional properties. Plants are disclosed that contain a mutation in a delta-12 or delta-15 fatty acid desaturase gene. Preferred plants are rapeseed and sunflower plants. Plants carrying such mutant genes have altered fatty acid composition in seeds. In one embodiment, a plant contains a mutation in a region having the conserved motif His-Xaa-Xaa-Xaa-His, found in delta-12 and delta-15 fatty acid desaturases. A preferred motif has the sequence His-Glu-Cys-Gly-His. A preferred mutation in this motif has the amino acid sequence His-Lys-Cys-Gly-His. Nucleic acid fragments are disclosed that comprise a mutant delta-12 or delta-15 fatty acid desaturase gene sequence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01H 1/06; A01H 1/00; A01H 5/10; C07C 53/126; C07C 57/03; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0083 (2013.01); C12N 15/8247 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856239 A1 19981217; AU 750363 B2 20020718; AU 8071598 A 19981230; CA 2293810 A1 19981217; CA 2293810 C 20100309; EP 0987936 A1 20000329; EP 0987936 A4 20010314; JP 2002508659 A 20020319; JP 4209949 B2 20090114

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090427

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEBONTE, LORIN, R.

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHEGONG, FAN

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUO-HUA MIAO

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHORROSH, BASIL, S.

2001-03-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT