Global patent index - EP 0987971 A2

EP 0987971 A2 2000-03-29 - PRESENTATION CONTAINER

Title (en)

PRESENTATION CONTAINER

Title (de)

PRÄSENTATIONSBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

PRESENTOIR

Publication

EP 0987971 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99916762 A

Priority

  • DE 9900527 W
  • DE 19808162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808162A1] The invention relates to a presentation container for forward feed devices for goods packages stacked one behind the other in rows. The inventive presentation container enables optimal flow and handling of the goods in terms of cost and time as well as placement optimisation and the greatest possible use of space. To this end, the presentation container (1) has a recess (2) in its back wall (4) whose dimensions are at least equivalent to those of a goods slide (3) of a forward feed device (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/12 (2006.01); A47F 5/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/11 (2013.01); A47F 1/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943241A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808162 A1 19990909; DE 19808162 C2 20010308; AT 206889 T 20011115; EP 0987971 A2 20000329; EP 0987971 B1 20011017; WO 9943241 A2 19990902; WO 9943241 A3 19991021

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160205

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160204

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160205

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VOSSHENRICH UDO

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-07-12 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2002-05-17 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-17 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

- Free Format Text: ERRATUM: THE TRANSLATION ON EP0987971 HAS BEEN REGISTERED IN ERROR. THE ENTRY FOR EP0987971 PUBLISHED IN PATENTS AND DESIGNS JOURNAL NUMBER 5886 DATED 13 MARCH 2002 SHOULD NOT HAVE APPEARED. THIS CASE WILL BE REGISTERED AT A FUTURE DATE.

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020118

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900320

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-22

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2001-10-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 206889

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOSSHENRICH, UDO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOSSHENRICH, UDO

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL