Global Patent Index - EP 0987977 A1

EP 0987977 A1 2000-03-29 - VACUUM CLEANER CORD REEL

Title (en)

VACUUM CLEANER CORD REEL

Title (de)

KABELAUFROLLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN STAUBSAUGER

Title (fr)

ENROULEUR POUR ASPIRATEUR

Publication

EP 0987977 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98929477 A

Priority

  • FR 9801123 W
  • FR 9707132 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764181A1] The invention concerns an electric cord (20) reel (12) for an electric household appliance, in particular a vacuum cleaner, comprising a drum (7) including a hub radially extended by a disk, at the periphery of which is located a ring for reeling and maintaining the electric cord (20), an assembly blocking (27) the drum (7) comprising a brake (57) provided to prevent the reel (12) drum (7) from turning in the direction reeling the electric cord (20), and a control knob (4) arranged to co-operate with the blocking assembly (27). The invention is characterised in that said brake is arranged in the inner space defined by the ring so as to be urged to press against said ring inner surface. The invention also concerns a base for an electric appliance comprising a reel (12) whereof the reeling knob (4) can take up two positions for engaging or not the blocking assembly (27) against the drum (7), and for blocking said assembly in a position releasing the blocking assembly (27) against the drum (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/26; B65H 75/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/26 (2006.01); B65H 75/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/4434 (2013.01); A47L 9/26 (2013.01); B65H 75/4431 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855012A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764181 A1 19981211; FR 2764181 B1 19990730; AU 7922498 A 19981221; DE 69809549 D1 20030102; DE 69809549 T2 20030821; EP 0987977 A1 20000329; EP 0987977 B1 20021120; ES 2187977 T3 20030616; JP 2002503125 A 20020129; PL 337018 A1 20000731; TR 9902958 T2 20000522; WO 9855012 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060603

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060603

2005-06-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050603

2005-06-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050603

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050301

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187977 T3

2003-06-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809549 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT