Global Patent Index - EP 0988024 A1

EP 0988024 A1 2000-03-29 - BRINE TREATMENT

Title (en)

BRINE TREATMENT

Title (de)

SOLEBEHANDLUNGSMETHODE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE LA SAUMURE

Publication

EP 0988024 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918739 A

Priority

  • GB 9708820 A
  • US 9808356 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848777A1] An additive for brine and/or a method of treating brine so as to protect skin tissue from attack when in contact with the brine discloses the use of an epidermically effective amount of a surfactant, polymer and/or oil. Examples are given of suitable oils, polymers and surfactants which may be used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/31 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/368 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/55 (2006.01); A61K 8/63 (2006.01); A61K 8/64 (2006.01); A61K 8/65 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 17/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/31 (2013.01); A61K 8/345 (2013.01); A61K 8/365 (2013.01); A61K 8/368 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/494 (2013.01); A61K 8/553 (2013.01); A61K 8/63 (2013.01); A61K 8/645 (2013.01); A61K 8/65 (2013.01); A61K 8/678 (2013.01); A61K 8/73 (2013.01); A61K 8/731 (2013.01); A61K 8/735 (2013.01); A61K 8/891 (2013.01); A61K 8/922 (2013.01); A61K 8/925 (2013.01); A61K 8/97 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848777 A1 19981105; AU 7160898 A 19981124; AU 727844 B2 20010104; CA 2288193 A1 19981105; EP 0988024 A1 20000329; EP 0988024 A4 20000726; GB 9708820 D0 19970625; NO 995295 A 19991229; NO 995295 D0 19991029

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 7/48 A, 7A 61K 7/40 B

2000-07-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL