Global Patent Index - EP 0988121 A1

EP 0988121 A1 2000-03-29 - UNWINDING ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR WIRE OR MATERIALS CONTAINING SEVERAL WIRES

Title (en)

UNWINDING ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR WIRE OR MATERIALS CONTAINING SEVERAL WIRES

Title (de)

ABSPULRICHTER FÜR DRAHT- ODER MEHRDRAHTFÖRMIGES GUT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE DEROULEMENT POUR MATERIAU SOUS FORME D'UN FIL OU DE PLUSIEURS FILS METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 0988121 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934915 A

Priority

  • DE 19723635 A
  • EP 9803357 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723635A1] The invention relates to an unwinding device for wire or materials containing several wires, comprising a rotating support (8) for a reel (9), a coil or the like and a folding roller (18) allocated to a processing device (19). According to the invention, a dancer (13) is disposed between the support (8) and the folding roller (18). A constant direction for unwinding and winding is maintained in such a way that the unwound or wound material is directed along the same plane of curvature as the curvature of the reel devoid of torque.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 23/00; B21C 47/00; B65H 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/20 (2006.01); B21F 1/02 (2006.01); B21F 23/00 (2006.01); B65H 59/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/36 (2013.01); B21C 47/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855247A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723635 A1 19981210; DE 19723635 C2 19990325; AT 209983 T 20011215; AU 735067 B2 20010628; AU 8436198 A 19981221; BR 9809541 A 20000620; CA 2293616 A1 19981210; EP 0988121 A1 20000329; EP 0988121 B1 20011205; JP 2002502316 A 20020122; NO 312346 B1 20020429; NO 995961 A 19991203; NO 995961 D0 19991203; NZ 501070 A 20001222; US 6237383 B1 20010529; WO 9855247 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050605

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WITELS APPARATE-MASCHINEN ALBERT G.M.B.H. & CO. K

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040605

2003-07-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030702

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209983 T 20011215

2001-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE