Global Patent Index - EP 0988121 B1

EP 0988121 B1 2001-12-05 - UNWINDING ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR WIRE OR MATERIALS CONTAINING SEVERAL WIRES

Title (en)

UNWINDING ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR WIRE OR MATERIALS CONTAINING SEVERAL WIRES

Title (de)

ABSPULRICHTER FÜR DRAHT- ODER MEHRDRAHTFÖRMIGES GUT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE DEROULEMENT POUR MATERIAU SOUS FORME D'UN FIL OU DE PLUSIEURS FILS METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 0988121 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934915 A

Priority

  • DE 19723635 A
  • EP 9803357 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723635A1] The invention relates to an unwinding device for wire or materials containing several wires, comprising a rotating support (8) for a reel (9), a coil or the like and a folding roller (18) allocated to a processing device (19). According to the invention, a dancer (13) is disposed between the support (8) and the folding roller (18). A constant direction for unwinding and winding is maintained in such a way that the unwound or wound material is directed along the same plane of curvature as the curvature of the reel devoid of torque.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 23/00; B21C 47/00; B65H 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/20 (2006.01); B21F 1/02 (2006.01); B21F 23/00 (2006.01); B65H 59/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/36 (2013.01); B21C 47/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723635 A1 19981210; DE 19723635 C2 19990325; AT 209983 T 20011215; AU 735067 B2 20010628; AU 8436198 A 19981221; BR 9809541 A 20000620; CA 2293616 A1 19981210; EP 0988121 A1 20000329; EP 0988121 B1 20011205; JP 2002502316 A 20020122; NO 312346 B1 20020429; NO 995961 A 19991203; NO 995961 D0 19991203; NZ 501070 A 20001222; US 6237383 B1 20010529; WO 9855247 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050605

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WITELS APPARATE-MASCHINEN ALBERT G.M.B.H. & CO. K

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040605

2003-07-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030702

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209983 T 20011215

2001-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE