Global Patent Index - EP 0988122 B1

EP 0988122 B1 2001-05-09 - MULTISTAGE METAL-FORMING MACHINE TOOL

Title (en)

MULTISTAGE METAL-FORMING MACHINE TOOL

Title (de)

MEHRSTUFIGE UMFORMMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL DE FORMAGE EN PLUSIEURS ETAPES

Publication

EP 0988122 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922569 A

Priority

  • CH 9800249 W
  • CH 144997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857765A1] The invention relates to a multistage metal-forming machine tool having a last metal-forming station which divides combined pieces into two finished pieces (21, 22), and two delivery devices (3, 4) for the finished pieces. Each delivery device (3, 4) is assigned a transfer device (6), which transfers a finished piece (21, 22) from the last forming station to the delivery device (3, 4). One of the transfer devices comprises transfer tongs having an upper claw with two clamping jaws (521, 522) and a lower claw with one clamping jaw (531). The other transfer device (6) has a slide way (61) for receiving a finished piece (22) from the last forming station, as well as a pivoting kick handle (62) for pushing a finished piece (22) situated on the slide way (61) to the delivery device (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21K 1/04; B21J 13/14; B21K 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 13/08 (2006.01); B21J 13/14 (2006.01); B21K 1/04 (2006.01); B21K 27/00 (2006.01); B21K 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21K 27/04 (2013.01); B21J 13/14 (2013.01); B21K 1/04 (2013.01); Y10T 83/6518 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857765 A1 19981223; AU 7518298 A 19990104; CN 1084648 C 20020515; CN 1259065 A 20000705; CZ 9904174 A3 20011212; DE 59800691 D1 20010613; EA 001306 B1 20001225; EA 200000015 A1 20000626; EP 0988122 A1 20000329; EP 0988122 B1 20010509; ES 2156441 T3 20010616; JP 2001508704 A 20010703; KR 100349053 B1 20020821; KR 20010013213 A 20010226; TW 400257 B 20000801; US 6471035 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156441 T3

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800691 20010613

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991102

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL