Global Patent Index - EP 0988134 A1

EP 0988134 A1 2000-03-29 - CLAMPING CHUCK FOR BITS OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

CLAMPING CHUCK FOR BITS OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

SPANNFUTTER FÜR BITS ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

MANDRIN DE SERRAGE POUR EMBOUTS OU AUTRES

Publication

EP 0988134 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928315 A

Priority

  • DE 19722776 A
  • DE 19804081 A
  • EP 9803058 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6345560B1] A clamping chuck comprising a shank which has two sleeve-like shank sections (5, 6), one of the sleeve-like sections (6) on an end side thereof being coordinated to a clamping section (1) for clamping into a drive member, and the other of the sleeve-like sections (5) on its end side being coordinated to a toolholder (2) for mounting a tool, in particular a screwdriver bit (18). The two sleeve-like shank sections (5, 6), by a torsion section (3) formed by a torsion member (7) coordinated to cavities of the shank sections, being twistable with respect to one another about a stop-limited angular distance (a-b), wherein the torsion section (3) is arranged between two hexagon sections of the torsion member (7), by which hexagon sections the torsion member is fitted without play into hexagon profile sections in the cavities (10, 11) of the sleeve-like shank sections (5, 6), and the torsion member continues, as one material integral piece into the clamping section formed as an insertion section (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/001 (2013.01); B25B 23/0035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855268A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6345560 B1 20020212; AU 8020098 A 19981221; CN 1072546 C 20011010; CN 1259068 A 20000705; EP 0988134 A1 20000329; EP 0988134 B1 20020109; WO 9855268 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802840

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150524

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140515

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2003-02-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021201

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020523

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802840 20020228

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE