Global Patent Index - EP 0988157 B1

EP 0988157 B1 2002-09-18 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND OF VERIFICATION OF A SECURITY PAPER

Title (en)

A METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND OF VERIFICATION OF A SECURITY PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN UND ZUM PRÜFEN EINES SICHERHEITSPAPIERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET DE VERIFICATION D'UN PAPIER DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 0988157 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925816 A

Priority

  • GB 9801614 W
  • GB 9711469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2325883A] The part of the security thread exposed in the window has a matt non-reflective appearance and closely matches in colour a portion of the surface surrounding the window, whereby when the thread is viewed in reflected light in the visible spectrum the exposed part of the security thread is unobtrusive. The thread 11 may comprise a substrate 20 with a metallic layer 21 covered by a matt pale yellow coating 22, the yellow coating comprising a luminescent material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B44F 1/12 (2006.01); G01N 21/84 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/355 (2014.10); B42D 25/373 (2014.10); B42D 25/382 (2013.01); B42D 25/387 (2014.10); B42D 2035/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2325883 A 19981209; GB 2325883 B 20000112; GB 9711469 D0 19970730; AU 734104 B2 20010607; AU 7779398 A 19981221; BR 9810404 A 20011211; CA 2290586 A1 19981210; CN 1098774 C 20030115; CN 1259092 A 20000705; DE 69808082 D1 20021024; DE 69808082 T2 20030528; EP 0988157 A1 20000329; EP 0988157 B1 20020918; ES 2184274 T3 20030401; ID 20920 A 19990325; JP 2002508718 A 20020319; KR 20010013237 A 20010226; PL 337165 A1 20000731; RU 2000100326 A 20040320; RU 2163197 C1 20010220; WO 9855333 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050604

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050603

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050604

2005-06-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050603

2004-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184274 T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808082 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991122

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991122