Global Patent Index - EP 0988229 A2

EP 0988229 A2 2000-03-29 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MODIFYING ICE ADHESION STRENGTH

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MODIFYING ICE ADHESION STRENGTH

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÄNDERN DER STÄRKE VON EIS

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE MODIFICATION DE LA FORCE D'ADHERENCE DE LA GLACE

Publication

EP 0988229 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98929077 A

Priority

  • US 9812421 W
  • US 4979097 P
  • US 7962398 P
  • US 7991598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857851A2] The invention includes system for modifying ice adhesion strength of ice adhered to an object. The system includes an electrode that is electrically insulated from the object and a DC source, e.g., a battery, coupled to the object and the electrode. The source generates a DC bias to an interface between the ice and the object when the ice completes the circuit. The object is conductive or is doped as a semiconductor so that the DC bias applies a voltage to the interface which modifies the ice adhesion strength selectively as compared to the ice adhesion strength with substantially zero bias voltage at the interface. The strength can be increased or decreased relative to its static state (i.e., the state without applied voltage). In this manner, ice such as ice on an aircraft wing can be removed with less work. The system preferably includes an electrically insulating material disposed between the object and the electrode; the insulating material is substantially conformal to the object and the electrode. In most applications, the electrode includes a grid electrode shaped to conform to a surface of the object and each point of the grid electrode is in electrical contact with the source. Accordingly, a grid insulator is generally disposed between the object and the grid electrode. The invention has high applicability to objects such as an aircraft wing, an automobile windshield, a bottom of a ski, a heel or sole of a boot or shoe, and an outer material of a power line. The invention also includes a ferroelectric, ferromagnetic or semiconductor coating applied to power lines to autoregulate the temperature of the lines to just above the melting point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64D 15/12 (2006.01); C09K 3/18 (2006.01); H02G 7/16 (2006.01); H05B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02G 7/16 (2013.01); B64D 15/12 (2013.01); H05B 3/00 (2013.01); H05B 2214/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857851 A2 19981223; WO 9857851 A3 19990415; AU 8072998 A 19990104; BR 9810527 A 20001219; CA 2293399 A1 19981223; CA 2293399 C 20070821; CN 1077062 C 20020102; CN 1240081 C 20060201; CN 1260755 A 20000719; CN 1352457 A 20020605; EP 0988229 A2 20000329; EP 0988229 A4 20020227; HK 1029557 A1 20020802; IL 133302 A 20031210; IL 133302 D0 20010430; JP 2000514756 A 20001107; JP 2006029774 A 20060202

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070124

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-02-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 64F 1/00 A, 7B 64D 15/00 B, 7H 02G 7/16 B

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 64F 1/00 A, 7B 64D 15/00 B

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE