Global patent index - EP 0988256 A1

EP 0988256 A1 2000-03-29 - APPARATUS FOR AND PROCESS OF WATER GRANULATING MATTE OR SLAG

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR AND PROCESS OF WATER GRANULATING MATTE OR SLAG

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GRANULIEREN VON SCHLACKEN IN WASSER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE GRANULATION A L'EAU DE MATTE OU DE SCORIES

Publication

EP 0988256 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923836 A

Priority

  • US 9810882 W
  • US 86648497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854103A1] Molten matte or slag is water granulated by feeding molten matte or slag through a launder (10a, 10b) to a granulator tank (11a, 11b). Tank (11a, 11b) comprises sloping walls and is equipped with adjustable overflow weirs (22b) and one or more spray nozzles (19a, 19b). Nozzles (19a, 19b) are positioned so water that they emit impacts substantially all of the molten matte or slag that is fed to granulator tank (11a, 11b). Granulation tank (11a, 11b) is optionally coated with a polymeric material to reduce the potential for phreatic explosions. The granulator is optionally equipped with a gas offtake (16b) which can be connected directly to quench tower (14b) which in turn can be connected to an induced ventilation system (15). The granulator is preferably fitted with an explosion relief opening (27b) consisting of durable channels (28b) with explosion relief opening (27b) preferably covered with a polymeric material (29b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 37/00; B01J 2/00; B22F 9/06; C04B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 19/00 (2006.01); B01J 2/00 (2006.01); C03B 19/10 (2006.01); C03B 37/00 (2006.01); C04B 5/02 (2006.01); C21B 3/06 (2006.01); C21B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 19/1045 (2013.01); C21B 3/06 (2013.01); C21B 3/08 (2013.01); Y02W 30/543 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854103 A1 19981203; AU 730145 B2 20010301; AU 7603398 A 19981230; BG 103935 A 20000731; BG 64257 B1 20040730; BR 9809195 A 20000801; CA 2290500 A1 19981203; CA 2290500 C 20070320; CN 1114565 C 20030716; CN 1259108 A 20000705; EP 0988256 A1 20000329; EP 0988256 A4 20000719; JP 2002501471 A 20020115; KR 100507883 B1 20050817; KR 20010013038 A 20010226; PL 186835 B1 20040331; PL 337082 A1 20000731; RU 2203864 C2 20030510; TR 9902919 T2 20000221; YU 62099 A 20001228

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040419

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KENNECOTT HOLDINGS CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES SE

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 03B 37/00 A, 7B 22F 9/06 B, 7B 01J 2/00 B, 7C 04B 5/02 B, 7C 03B 19/10 B, 7C 21B 3/06 B

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES SE