Global patent index - EP 0988295 A1

EP 0988295 A1 2000-03-29 - HETEROCYCLIC SUBSTITUTED PIPERIDINES AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

HETEROCYCLIC SUBSTITUTED PIPERIDINES AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

DURCH EINEN HETEROZYKLISCHEN REST SUBSTITUIERTE PIPERIDINE UND IHRE ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PIPERIDINES A SUBSTITUTION HETEROCYCLIQUE ET UTILISATIONS DE CES DERNIERES

Publication

EP 0988295 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931350 A

Priority

  • US 9812668 W
  • US 87784697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857940A1] This invention is directed to oxazolidinone compounds which are selective antagonists for human alpha 1A receptors. This invention is also related to uses of these compounds for lowering intraocular pressure, inhibiting cholesterol synthesis, relaxing lower urinary tract tissue, the treatment of benign prostatic hyperplasia, impotency, cardiac arrhythmia and for the treatment of any disease where the antagonism of the alpha 1A receptor may be useful. The invention further provides a pharmaceutical composition comprising a therapeutically effective amount of the above-defined compounds and a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 263/20; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/42; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/495; A61K 31/505; C07D 277/14; C07D 403/06; C07D 411/12; C07D 413/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 263/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/5355 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/08 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01); A61P 27/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 263/20 (2006.01); C07D 263/26 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/06 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 263/20 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01); C07D 417/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857940 A1 19981223; AU 740064 B2 20011025; AU 8149898 A 19990104; CA 2294549 A1 19981223; EP 0988295 A1 20000329; EP 0988295 A4 20030813; JP 2002505683 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000108

2003-08-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 263/20 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 277/14 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 403/06 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 411/12 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 413/12 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/415 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/42 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/425 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/445 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/495 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 263/26 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 265/10 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 401/12 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 401/14 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 413/14 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 417/14 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE