Global Patent Index - EP 0988350 A1

EP 0988350 A1 2000-03-29 - WATER-BASED OFFSET LITHOGRAPHIC NEWSPAPER PRINTING INK

Title (en)

WATER-BASED OFFSET LITHOGRAPHIC NEWSPAPER PRINTING INK

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGE OFFSETLITHOGRAPHISCHE ZEITSCHRIFTENDRUCKTINTE

Title (fr)

ENCRE AQUEUSE POUR L'IMPRESSION OFFSET DE JOURNAUX

Publication

EP 0988350 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959394 A

Priority

  • US 9823792 W
  • US 97860497 A
  • US 17916498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927022A1] A single fluid water-based offset lithographic news ink comprising water; a macromolecular resin binder comprised of resins soluble in water regardless of the pH of the water, resin rosin salts soluble in water at pH ranging from 7.5 to 10 and aqueous emulsion resins; pigment; a soy bean based modified resin; and a hydroxyethylethylene urea re-wetting agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 11/02; C09D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927022A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927022 A1 19990603; CA 2297045 A1 19990603; EP 0988350 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060329

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021023

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRISHNAN, RAMASAMY

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOUNG, NEIL

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GAN, KEGI

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMAT, MARILYN

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BABIJ, HUGO

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CZEBOTAR, MARTIN, THOMAS

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE