Global Patent Index - EP 0988358 A1

EP 0988358 A1 2000-03-29 - AQUEOUS LUBRICANT COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MONOAMINE

Title (en)

AQUEOUS LUBRICANT COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MONOAMINE

Title (de)

MONOAMINE ENTHALTENDE WÄSSRIGE SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG VERWENDBAR ZUM SCHMIEREN VON TRANSPORTBÄNDERN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE AQUEUSE RENFERMANT UNE MONOAMINE

Publication

EP 0988358 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97928192 A

Priority

  • DE 29719408 U
  • EP 9703080 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856881A1] The invention is directed to an aqueous lubricant concentrate composition which is usable for the preparation of an aqueous lubricating solution for lubricating conveyor belts and conveyor chains in the food and beverage industry. The composition comprises at least one monoamine compound as the main lubricating agent; an effective amount of a deposition-preventing component capable of preventing the deposition of solids from the lubricating solution under lubricating application conditions at least to such an extent that said lubricating application is not impaired by such depositions, without impairing the lubricating film-forming properties of the aqueous lubricating solution, and optionally further comprises a disinfectant, and other customary additives.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 129/32 (2013.01); C10M 129/36 (2013.01); C10M 133/06 (2013.01); C10M 133/08 (2013.01); C10M 135/08 (2013.01); C10M 135/10 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 145/26 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2207/121 (2013.01); C10M 2207/122 (2013.01); C10M 2207/124 (2013.01); C10M 2209/103 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2219/04 (2013.01); C10M 2219/042 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2225/00 (2013.01); C10M 2225/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2215/04 + C10M 2215/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719408 U1 19980319; AU 3258297 A 19981230; AU 738450 B2 20010920; EP 0988358 A1 20000329; EP 0988358 B1 20040915; GB 2329644 A 19990331; GB 2329644 B 20020327; GB 9815622 D0 19980916; WO 9856881 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69730746

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090612

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2006-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-06-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050612

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-12-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041226

2004-12-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CALVATIS GMBH

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730746 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CALVATIS GMBH

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV RO SI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KLEENCARE HYGIENE GMBH

2002-08-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LHS (UK) LIMITED

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981015

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19981015;LT PAYMENT 19981015;LV PAYMENT 19981015;RO PAYMENT 19981015;SI PAYMENT 19981015