Global Patent Index - EP 0988371 A4

EP 0988371 A4 2002-11-04 - HUMAN TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR TR9

Title (en)

HUMAN TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR TR9

Title (de)

HUMANER TUMORNEKROSEFAKTOR-REZEPTOR TR 9

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR HUMAIN TR9 DU FACTEUR DE NECROSE TUMORALE

Publication

EP 0988371 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98926471 A

Priority

  • US 9811932 W
  • US 5299197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856892A1] The present invention relates to a novel member of the tumor necrosis factor family of receptors. In particular, isolated nucleic acid molecules are provided encoding the human TR9 receptor. TR9 polypeptides are also provided as are vectors, host cells and recombinant methods for producing the same. The invention further relates to screening methods for identifying agonists and antagonists of TR9 receptor activity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70578 (2013.01); C07K 14/4747 (2013.01); C07K 14/7151 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [T] WO 0056862 A1 20000928 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [T] US 6358508 B1 20020319 - NI JIAN [US], et al
  • [T] WO 9911790 A1 19990311 - ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 19 January 1997 (1997-01-19), XP002215169, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. AA155873
  • [PA] DATABASE EMBL [online] 22 April 1998 (1998-04-22), XP002215170, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. AA918818
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 5 October 1996 (1996-10-05), XP002215171, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. AA072902
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 19 January 1997 (1997-01-19), XP002215172, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. AA186423
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 18 February 1996 (1996-02-18), XP002215173, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. N49208
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 27 August 1995 (1995-08-27), XP002215174, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. D59902
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 18 January 1997 (1997-01-18), XP002215175, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. AA156356
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL [online] 5 August 1995 (1995-08-05), XP002215176, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. H41873
  • See also references of WO 9856892A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856892 A1 19981217; AU 7830398 A 19981230; CA 2295991 A1 19981217; EP 0988371 A1 20000329; EP 0988371 A4 20021104; JP 2002503963 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101110

2011-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC.

2010-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 14/47 20060101AFI20100412BHEP

2010-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 14/705 20060101ALI20100412BHEP

2010-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 14/715 20060101ALI20100412BHEP

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040701

2002-12-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-11-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE