Global patent index - EP 0988403 A1

EP 0988403 A1 2000-03-29 - SLEWING MECHANISM WITH AN ARM

Title (en)

SLEWING MECHANISM WITH AN ARM

Title (de)

SCHWENKVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSLEGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PIVOTEMENT MUNI D'UN BRAS

Publication

EP 0988403 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922793 A

Priority

  • EP 9802602 W
  • LU 90078 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856960A1] The invention relates to a device (14) for slewing a working unit (16) between a rest position and a work position, comprising an arm (20) and a support structure (18), one end of the arm (20) being arranged in said support structure (18) in such a way that it can swivel. A swivel arm (38) with an actuating drive (42) is positioned with one end arranged in said support structure (18) in such a way that it can swivel. The other end of said swivel arm (38) has an articulated connection with a lift drive (28), the second end of said lift drive having an articulated connection with the arm (20). The swivelling axis (40) of the swivel arm (38) is positioned at a set distance from the swivelling axis (22) of the arm (20) so that the lever arm can be raised. This allows the lift drive (28) to transmit its power to the arm (20) in the working position. This excentric position of the swivel arm (38) also allows the actuating drive (42) of the swivel arm (38) to switch largely without power when the arm (20) is in the working position. The slewing device (14) is especially suitable for tap hole plugging machines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856960A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856960 A1 19981217; AT 204913 T 20010915; AU 7529998 A 19981230; BR 9809543 A 20000620; CN 1073627 C 20011024; CN 1260008 A 20000712; CZ 289865 B6 20020417; CZ 9904398 A3 20001011; DE 59801329 D1 20011004; EP 0988403 A1 20000329; EP 0988403 B1 20010829; HK 1027598 A1 20020308; JP 2002503291 A 20020129; JP 4220578 B2 20090204; KR 100497150 B1 20050629; KR 20010013186 A 20010226; LU 90078 A2 19981214; RU 2196833 C2 20030120; TW 428028 B 20010401; US 6245286 B1 20010612; ZA 9805067 B 19990114

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150502

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150502

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 204913

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150502

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801329

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-04

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 204913

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT