Global Patent Index - EP 0988409 A1

EP 0988409 A1 2000-03-29 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING WOVEN FABRIC

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING WOVEN FABRIC

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WEBWARE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TISSU TISSE

Publication

EP 0988409 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939497 A

Priority

  • DE 19724893 A
  • EP 9803451 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724893A1] The invention relates to a method for producing woven fabric of defined length, consisting of the following steps: 1. placement of the warp ends in a warp end position in a frame determining the defined length and fixation of the warp ends in the frame (warp end station); 2. placement of the frame into a weft device with a shedding device (1st transfer stage); 3. positioning of the weft with actuation of the shedding device (weft station); 4. filling of the frame with the finished woven fabric to the maximum size of the frame (2nd transfer stage); removal of the woven fabric from the frame (removal post).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/00 (2006.01); D02H 3/00 (2006.01); D03D 23/00 (2006.01); D03D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 29/00 (2013.01); D03D 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856967A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724893 A1 19981217; AU 8799198 A 19981230; EP 0988409 A1 20000329; EP 0988409 B1 20011219; JP 2002503296 A 20020129; TW 393535 B 20000611; US 5909750 A 19990608; WO 9856967 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SANDERS FALK-HAYO

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802548 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI