Global Patent Index - EP 0988447 A1

EP 0988447 A1 2000-03-29 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0988447 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958204 A

Priority

  • DE 9803076 W
  • DE 19756103 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756103A1] A fuel injection valve for fuel injection systems of internal combustion engines, in particular for injecting fuel directly into the combustion chamber of an internal combustion engine, has a magnet coil (1), an armature (19) that can be pushed through the magnet coil (1) in a first lift direction (58) against a first restoring spring (33) and a valve needle (20) linked to a valve closing element (28). The armature (19) form-fittingly engages the valve needle (20) in the lift direction (58). In the opposite direction, the armature (19) can move freely, independently of the valve needle (20), against a second restoring spring (50). According to the invention, the armature (19) is mounted on the valve needle (20) by means of a slide bearing (56, 57) with several balls (59, 70).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0685 (2013.01); F02M 2200/306 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931379A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756103 A1 19990624; EP 0988447 A1 20000329; EP 0988447 B1 20030910; JP 2001511868 A 20010814; KR 20000071121 A 20001125; US 6170767 B1 20010109; WO 9931379 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-03-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809577 P 20031016

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020724

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI