Global Patent Index - EP 0988449 A1

EP 0988449 A1 2000-03-29 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION DEVICE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0988449 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914552 A

Priority

  • DE 19815918 A
  • EP 9902117 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815918A1] A fuel injection device for internal combustion engines, especially two-stroke diesel engines, comprising an eccentric injection-nozzle tip (4) protruding into an associated combustion chamber, whereby said nozzle tip has a pocket drill hole (3) with several outgoing injection-nozzle drill holes (13) which can be impinged upon with fuel. At least the axes of the outer nozzle tip drill holes (13) of said row of drill holes are directed inwards in relation to a radial progression. The conditions for fuel admission are approximately the same for all nozzle drill holes (13) resulting in a stable jet. Admission chambers (16) depart from the pocket drill hole (3) and are assigned to at least one part of the nozzle drill holes (13), whereby the diameter inside the chambers is greater than the diameter of the nozzle drill holes (13) and said chambers are designed in such a way that at least similar length ratios exist for all nozzle drill holes (13) in the row of drill holes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1806 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953196A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815918 A1 19991021; AU 3332799 A 19991101; CN 1093226 C 20021023; CN 1263584 A 20000816; EP 0988449 A1 20000329; EP 0988449 B1 20030716; JP 2000516687 A 20001212; JP 3308551 B2 20020729; KR 100361442 B1 20021121; KR 20010013569 A 20010226; PL 202429 B1 20090630; PL 337334 A1 20000814; RU 2175728 C2 20011110; WO 9953196 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906287 P 20030821

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLARUP, JOHANNES

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BJERREGAARD, HENRIK

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020729

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL