Global Patent Index - EP 0988496 A1

EP 0988496 A1 2000-03-29 - REFRIGERATOR

Title (en)

REFRIGERATOR

Title (de)

KÜHLGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL REFRIGERANT

Publication

EP 0988496 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929435 A

Priority

  • DE 19724267 A
  • EP 9803462 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724267A1] The invention relates to a refrigerator having a heat insulated refrigerating chamber (15) which is lined with an inner casing (20) and can be closed by a door. The chamber (15) is cooled by an evaporator (16, 19) which is mounted on at least one of the vertical walls, and which can be defrosted. A collecting pipe (23) with an outlet opening (25) forms one piece with the inner casing (20), and is mounted under the evaporator, for collecting the melt water formed during defrosting. The melt water is carried off via the collecting pipe (23) into a machine chamber (12) which is at least partially under the cooling chamber (15). At least the ceiling of the machine chamber (12) is cased with a wall section (26). The inventive refrigerator is characterized in that the wall section has a water inlet connection piece (27) joined to an outlet connection piece (24) that is integral with the collecting pipe (23), thus forming a conduit for carrying off the melted water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/14 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/14 (2013.01); F25D 23/061 (2013.01); F25D 2321/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857107A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724267 A1 19981210; AT 225023 T 20021015; DK 0988496 T3 20030203; EP 0988496 A1 20000329; EP 0988496 B1 20020925; ES 2184284 T3 20030401; TR 9902856 T2 20000522; WO 9857107 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150610

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160728

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59805714

- Effective date: 20150402

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-03-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2004-06-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184284 T3

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021226

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805714 20021031

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225023 T 20021015

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010814

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE