Global Patent Index - EP 0988502 A1

EP 0988502 A1 2000-03-29 - PYROTECHNIC PROJECTILE FOR PRODUCING CONTINUOUS PATTERNS IN THE SKY

Title (en)

PYROTECHNIC PROJECTILE FOR PRODUCING CONTINUOUS PATTERNS IN THE SKY

Title (de)

FEUERWERKSKÖRPER ZUR BILDUNG VON MOTIVEN AM HIMMEL

Title (fr)

PROJECTILE PYROTECHNIQUE POUR LA REALISATION DANS LE CIEL DE MOTIFS D'ASPECT CONTINU

Publication

EP 0988502 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98930855 A

Priority

  • FR 9801261 W
  • FR 9707442 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764687A1] The invention concerns a pyrotechnic projectile comprising a body containing a bursting charge (4) and a combustible charge (5) which is ignited and dispersed by the bursting charge (4), characterised in that the combustible charge (5) is formed by a metallic powder combustible with oxygen, arranged in the bursting charge (4) according to a pattern corresponding of the flare pattern to be obtained in the sky. The metallic powder can be titanium, aluminum or magnesium powder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 4/06; C06B 45/00; C06C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/00 (2006.01); C06C 15/00 (2006.01); F42B 4/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/00 (2013.01); C06C 15/00 (2013.01); F42B 4/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858225A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764687 A1 19981218; FR 2764687 B1 19990827; AU 8114498 A 19990104; CA 2294825 A1 19981223; CA 2294825 C 20030812; EP 0988502 A1 20000329; EP 0988502 B1 20030312; ES 2189191 T3 20030701; US 6324981 B1 20011204; WO 9858225 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150617

2016-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160728

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150616

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150616

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150616

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189191 T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT