Global Patent Index - EP 0988524 A1

EP 0988524 A1 2000-03-29 - SOLID-STATE FLUOROMETER AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR

Title (en)

SOLID-STATE FLUOROMETER AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR

Title (de)

FESTKÖRPERFLUORIMETER UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

FLUOROMETRE A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET SES PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0988524 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928987 A

Priority

  • US 9812054 W
  • US 87304697 A
  • US 87745297 A
  • US 8746698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857153A1] The fluorescent resulting from the diode laser (12) or LED excitation source (112) is imaged (optionally with a lens) (14, 114) onto a silicon photodiode detector (16, 116). An optical filter (18, 118) is placed between the sample cell (20, 120) and the photodiode detector to reject scattered excitation light. The output from the photodiode is amplified (22, 122) to produce an output voltage proportional to the quantity of fluorescence striking the photodiode detector. Since fluorescence is proportional to the concentration of the fluorophore present in the sample stream, and the concentration of the fluorophore is further proportional to the concentration of a chemical treatment agent or other additive present, then continuous monitoring of a voltage output may be performed which allows real-time measurement of the amount of chemical treatment agent or other additive present in the system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01N 33/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/643 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857153A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857153 A1 19981217; AU 737221 B2 20010816; AU 8065798 A 19981230; CN 1183382 C 20050105; CN 1260043 A 20000712; EP 0988524 A1 20000329; EP 1496351 A2 20050112; EP 1496351 A3 20060315; EP 1496351 B1 20130327; ES 2403051 T3 20130513; HK 1027624 A1 20050812; JP 2002514308 A 20020514; MY 132154 A 20070928; PT 1496351 E 20130423

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2004-11-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040908

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALFANO, JOSEPH, C.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FEHR, MICHAEL, J.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GODFREY, MARTIN, R.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOOTS, JOHN, E.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOEGGENBORG, KEVIN, J.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAO, NARASIMHA, M.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RASIMAS, JEFFREY, P.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUBERGEN, KAREN, R.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALFANO, JOSEPH, C.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FEHR, MICHAEL, J.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GODFREY, MARTIN, R.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOOTS, JOHN, E.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOEGGENBORG, KEVIN, J.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAO, NARASIMHA, M.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RASIMAS, JEFFREY, P.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUBERGEN, KAREN, R.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALFANO, JOSEPH, C.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FEHR, MICHAEL, J.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GODFREY, MARTIN, R.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOOTS, JOHN, E.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOEGGENBORG, KEVIN, J.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAO, NARASIMHA, M.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RASIMAS, JEFFREY, P.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUBERGEN, KAREN, R.

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE