Global patent index - EP 0988531 A1

EP 0988531 A1 2000-03-29 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND/OR ANALYSING BIOLOGICAL SUBSTANCES, PRESENT IN A CONDUCTIVE LIQUID, DEVICE AND AFFINITY SENSOR USED FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND/OR ANALYSING BIOLOGICAL SUBSTANCES, PRESENT IN A CONDUCTIVE LIQUID, DEVICE AND AFFINITY SENSOR USED FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND AFFINITÄTSSENSOR ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND/ODER DOSIERUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN SUBSTANZEN IN EINER LEITENDEN FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION ET/OU DE DOSAGE DE SUBSTANCES BIOLOGIQUES, PRESENTES DANS UN LIQUIDE CONDUCTEUR, DISPOSITIF ET CAPTEUR D'AFFINITE UTILES POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0988531 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98930829 A

Priority

  • FR 9801213 W
  • FR 9707530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764702A1] The invention concerns an improved method for identifying and/or analysing polynucleotides PN present in a conductive liquid medium, using an affinity sensor comprising a multilayer structure semiconductor/insulant/probe = polynucleotides PNc complementary to the medium PN. The method consists in selecting non-marked PNc; polarising the semiconductor; periodically lighting it; measuring the flat band potential variations induced by loading effect phenomenon directly and essentially related to specific pairings between PN and PNc; and finally interpreting the signals collected at the end of the identification and/or analysis of PN. The invention also concerns the device and the sensor used for implementing the method. It is applicable to molecular biology analysis, e.g. diagnosis of viral or genetic diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/30; G01N 27/416

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/416 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 27/30 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6825 (2013.01); G01N 27/305 (2013.01); G01N 33/5438 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857157A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764702 A1 19981218; FR 2764702 B1 19990903; AU 8112898 A 19981230; CA 2294627 A1 19981217; CA 2294627 C 20090609; EP 0988531 A1 20000329; JP 2002503343 A 20020129; US 6475728 B1 20021105; WO 9857157 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status

2014-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140102

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050222

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLE CENTRALE DE LYON

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ECOLE CENTRALE DE LYON

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991231

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT