Global Patent Index - EP 0988579 A1

EP 0988579 A1 2000-03-29 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INKING A CHARGE PATTERN USING A TONER SPRAYING DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INKING A CHARGE PATTERN USING A TONER SPRAYING DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINFÄRBEN EINES LADUNGSBILDES ÜBER EINE TONERSPRÜHEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PIGMENTER UNE IMAGE ELECTRONIQUE DE CHARGE PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION DE TONER

Publication

EP 0988579 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928271 A

Priority

  • DE 19724950 A
  • EP 9802870 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857233A1] The invention relates to a developer device containing a toner spraying device (11) configured in the same way as a powder coating device. Said toner spraying device (11) produces a mixed stream (15) from a mixture of toner and air. Toner particles of a defined toner charge are deposited on an applicator roll (16) where they form a homogenous layer of toner, said applicator roll being located in the mixed stream (15). The toner particles jump over onto the carrier material (10) in a transfer area (18) with a narrow developer gap and ink said carrier material according to the charge pattern.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857233A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857233 A1 19981217; EP 0988579 A1 20000329; EP 0988579 B1 20030219; US 6377768 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807252 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB