Global patent index - EP 0988636 A1

EP 0988636 A1 2000-03-29 - SUPPORT PLATE OF A POTENTIOMETER, ESPECIALLY A THROTTLE POTENTIOMETER

Title (en)

SUPPORT PLATE OF A POTENTIOMETER, ESPECIALLY A THROTTLE POTENTIOMETER

Title (de)

TRÄGERPLATTE EINES POTENTIOMETERS, INSBESONDERE EINES DROSSELKLAPPEN-POTENTIOMETERS

Title (fr)

PLAQUE DE SUPPORT DE POTENTIOMETRE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN POTENTIOMETRE DE VANNE PAPILLON

Publication

EP 0988636 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907600 A

Priority

  • DE 19810844 A
  • EP 9901435 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19810844A1] The carrier plate (1) can be mounted on a base and has on one side spacers, as individual bumps, securable to the plate. They can be formed integrally with the plate by injection molding from plastics. The bumps may be in form of deposition faces e.g. in the region of fastening bores. Several carrier plates can be vertically stacked in a magazine (23) in readiness for farther processing and may have struts for securing of the stacked plates. A mandrel (25) may support the plate stack in the magazine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 1/01; H01C 10/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/30 (2006.01); F02D 9/00 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); G01D 5/165 (2006.01); H01C 1/01 (2006.01); H01C 10/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 10/34 (2013.01); H01C 1/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948118A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19810844 A1 19990923; EP 0988636 A1 20000329; EP 0988636 B1 20020605; JP 2002500719 A 20020108; WO 9948118 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050305

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050305

2004-03-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SUPPORT PLATE AS A POTENTIOMETER, ESPECIALLY A THROTTLE POTENTIOMETER

2001-08-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SUPPORT PLATE AS A POTENTIOMETER, ESPECIALLY A THROTTLE POTENTIOMETER

2001-08-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SUPPORT PLATE AS A POTENTIOMETER, ESPECIALLY A THROTTLE POTENTIOMETER

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB