Global Patent Index - EP 0988638 A1

EP 0988638 A1 2000-03-29 - ARCING CONTACT ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

ARCING CONTACT ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

ABBRANDSCHALTANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE CONTACTS D'ARC

Publication

EP 0988638 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911560 A

Priority

  • CH 9900146 W
  • DE 19816508 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19816508A1] Contact fingers (2) are connected to a first electric terminal by flexible ribbons (6) consisting of superposed strips of e.g., copper in order to create a large burn-off reserve. The connection section (7) of the ribbon (6) which adjoins and is rigidly connected to the contact fingers (2) is stiffened in each case by pressure-bonding the strips. When deactivated, the ribbons (6) and in part, the contact fingers (2) lie adjacent to an outwardly-pointing support surface (10). When activated, at least the contact fingers (2) and connecting sections (7) are raised off of the support surface (10) as the ribbons (6) bend, through contact with the outer surface of a contact pin which moves along an operating axis (1). The pressure force caused by the electromagnetic attraction between the relatively short contact fingers (2) and connecting sections (7), which each form an angle of approximately 30 DEG with the operating axis (1), roughly compensates for the contact repulsion whilst the forces which act on the flexible parts of the ribbons (6) are essentially collected by the support surface (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 31/02 (2006.01); H01H 1/38 (2006.01); H01H 33/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953512A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816508 A1 19991021; CN 1136595 C 20040128; CN 1263633 A 20000816; DE 59912794 D1 20051222; EP 0988638 A1 20000329; EP 0988638 B1 20051116; JP 2002505797 A 20020219; JP 3967387 B2 20070829; US 6259050 B1 20010710; WO 9953512 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912794 P 20051222

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2005-07-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZEHNDER, LUKAS

2005-07-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GAVRILITA, ION

2005-07-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLER, MARKUS

2005-07-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETER, JOERG

2005-07-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOENEMANN, THOMAS

2005-07-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARCING CONTACT ARRANGEMENT

2005-06-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARCING CONTACT ARRANGEMENT

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB HOCHSPANNUNGSTECHNIK AG

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI