Global patent index - EP 0988664 A1

EP 0988664 A1 2000-03-29 - ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTION

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTION

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE A FICHES

Publication

EP 0988664 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930696 A

Priority

  • DE 19724336 A
  • EP 9802901 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724336A1] The invention relates to a method for producing an electrical connection between a first contact partner part and a second contact partner part. According to the invention, the two parts are brought together and then interconnected non-detachably in a positive material fit or quasi- positive material fit, to form a plug-in connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 4/10 (2006.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/027 (2013.01); H01R 43/0221 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4914 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49142 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49144 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49179 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49181 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49208 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49211 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53209 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857393A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724336 A1 19981217; AT 209400 T 20011215; BR 9810425 A 20000919; EP 0988664 A1 20000329; EP 0988664 B1 20011121; ES 2168769 T3 20020616; JP 2002503382 A 20020129; KR 100635677 B1 20061017; KR 20010013600 A 20010226; MY 122253 A 20060429; US 2002144398 A1 20021010; US 2004107567 A1 20040610; US 7124501 B2 20061024; WO 9857393 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090516

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090516

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090516

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090516

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2168769

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802741

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 209400

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT