Global Patent Index - EP 0988665 A1

EP 0988665 A1 2000-03-29 - WATER TIGHT CONNECTING TERMINAL FOR A COATED OVERHEAD CABLE

Title (en)

WATER TIGHT CONNECTING TERMINAL FOR A COATED OVERHEAD CABLE

Title (de)

WASSERDICHTER ANSCHLUSS FÜR ISOLIERTES FREILEITUNGSKABEL

Title (fr)

BORNE DE RACCORDEMENT ETANCHE POUR LIGNE AERIENNE ISOLEE

Publication

EP 0988665 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925663 A

Priority

  • FI 9800499 W
  • FI 972505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9859392A1] The invention relates to a water tight terminal for a coated overhead cable, comprising two face-to-face adaptable jaw elements (1, 2) provided with conductor slots (3, 4; 5, 6) for wires to be joined, and slots (7, 8) transverse to the conductor slots for metallic clamp elements (13), as well as liners (15) partially surrounding the clamp elements. The clamp element (13) is provided, in line with the conductor slots, with conductor-insulation piercing teeth (14) which, upon clamping the terminal, emerge from within the liner (15) while the liner (15) compresses against the conductor insulation around the piercing point of the teeth (14). The flanks of the clamp elements (13) are provided with elongated bosses (16) remaining at least partially inside the liner near the base area of the teeth (14), arranged such that the bosses (16) resist excessive penetration of the teeth into the conductor and at the same time improve the sealing surrounding the clamp element (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859392A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IE PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9859392 A1 19981230; AT 216535 T 20020515; AU 7768698 A 19990104; EE 9900569 A 20000815; EP 0988665 A1 20000329; EP 0988665 B1 20020417; FI 101912 B1 19980915; FI 101912 B 19980915; FI 972505 A0 19970613; HU 0002793 A2 20001228; NO 996084 A 19991209; NO 996084 D0 19991209; PL 337332 A1 20000814

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-04-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020717

2003-01-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-07-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-07-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-06-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-05-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020521

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IE PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000113;LV PAYMENT 20000113;RO PAYMENT 20000113;SI PAYMENT 20000113

2002-04-17 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2002-04-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216535 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IE PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000113;LV PAYMENT 20000113;RO PAYMENT 20000113;SI PAYMENT 20000113