Global Patent Index - EP 0988775 A1

EP 0988775 A1 2000-03-29 - VIBRATION TRANSDUCERS FOR RESONANT PANEL-FORM LOUDSPEAKER AND LOUDSPEAKER WITH THE SAME

Title (en)

VIBRATION TRANSDUCERS FOR RESONANT PANEL-FORM LOUDSPEAKER AND LOUDSPEAKER WITH THE SAME

Title (de)

SCHWINGUNGSWANDLER FÜR RESONANTEN PLATTENFÖRMIGEN LAUTSPRECHER UND DAMIT VERSEHENER LAUTSPRECHER

Title (fr)

TRANSDUCTEUR DE VIBRATIONS POUR HAUT-PARLEUR RESONANT EN FORME DE PANNEAU, ET HAUT-PARLEUR EQUIPE DUDIT TRANSDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 0988775 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920643 A

Priority

  • GB 9801316 W
  • GB 9709438 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852383A1] A vibration exciter or transducer (4) for imparting bending wave energy to a resonant panel (2), wherein the exciter (4) is adapted to be coupled to the panel at a plurality of discrete positions (6) forming a triangular array.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/06; H04R 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/00 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01); H04R 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/066 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 2440/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852383A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852383 A1 19981119; AR 012678 A1 20001108; AT 205993 T 20011015; AU 7343698 A 19981208; AU 734941 B2 20010628; BR 9809609 A 20000704; CA 2290103 A1 19981119; CN 1255278 A 20000531; CO 4780082 A1 19990526; DE 69801755 D1 20011025; DE 69801755 T2 20020529; DK 0988775 T3 20020107; EP 0988775 A1 20000329; EP 0988775 B1 20010919; ES 2164423 T3 20020216; GB 9709438 D0 19970702; HK 1024134 A1 20020118; ID 20950 A 19990401; IL 132587 D0 20010319; JP 2002505813 A 20020219; KR 20010012364 A 20010215; PT 988775 E 20020328; TW 381404 B 20000201; ZA 9803836 B 19990125

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030507

2004-03-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-02-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-12-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-12-10 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFT FUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE G

2002-08-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFT FUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE G

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-05-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020510

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020430

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020423

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020415

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020415

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020412

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020411

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020409

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164423 T3

2002-02-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801755 20011025

2001-10-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205993 T 20011015

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991130

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE