Global Patent Index - EP 0988807 A1

EP 0988807 A1 2000-03-29 - Device and method for the quick manual attachment of buttons and the like

Title (en)

Device and method for the quick manual attachment of buttons and the like

Title (de)

Gerät und Verfahren zum schnelle und manuelle befestigung von knöpfen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour la fixation manuelle et rapide, des boutons

Publication

EP 0988807 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830546 A

Priority

EP 98830546 A

Abstract (en)

A device for the manual attachment of buttons and the like onto fabric or other supports includes two needles (1'), a stretchable ring (11) and a counterbutton (4) with a hole (6) and two pairs of fastening sites (7), each needle (1') having a point (2) at one end and means (8, 9) for releasably engaging the stretchable ring (11) at the other end. A corresponding attachment method which makes use of said device includes the following steps: a) threading the needles (1') through the holes of the button; b) piercing the fabric from the outside until the needles (1') come out on the other side so as to have corresponding loops of the stretchable ring (11) projecting therefrom; c) threading the needles (1') through the hole (6) of the counterbutton (4); d) stretching a loop of the stretchable ring (11) by pulling the relevant needle (1') until the end (7a) of a fastening site (7) is introduced into said loop and then pulling the loop towards the other fastening site (7) until the other end (7a) is introduced therein; e) repeating the preceding step for the other loop of the stretchable ring (11); f) disengaging the needles (1') from the stretchable ring (11). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 1/18; A41H 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41H 37/00 (2006.01); A44B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 1/185 (2013.01); A41H 37/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988807 A1 20000329; EP 0988807 B1 20030212; DE 69811365 D1 20030320; DE 69811365 T2 20031218

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090921

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZAVATTI MARIA CRISTINA

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060802

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69811365

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020117

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI